MS HB1231 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 41-29-113, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Add Certain Hallucinogenic Substances To Schedule I Of The Uniform Controlled Substances Act And To Exempt Certain Uses Of Cannabidiol; To Amend Section 41-29-119, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Add Lorcaserin To Schedule Iv Of The Uniform Controlled Substances Act; To Authorize A Pilot Program For Research And Dispensing Of Cannabidiol; To Amend Section 41-29-176, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Administrative Forfeiture Of Property Under The Uniform Controlled Substances Law; To Amend Section 2, Chapter 484, Laws Of 2013, To Extend The Repeal Date On Section 41-29-176; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled substance law; add certain drugs to Schedules I & IV.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 112 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-17 Approved by Governor
2014-03-30SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2014-03-30HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2014-03-28HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2014-03-28SenateConference Report Adopted
2014-03-27HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Mayo, Baker, Reynolds)
2014-03-27HouseConference Report Adopted
2014-03-26SenateConference Report Filed
2014-03-26HouseConference Report Filed
2014-03-21SenateConferees Named Jordan,Harkins,Hopson
2014-03-13HouseConferees Named Baker,Reynolds,Powell
2014-03-10HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2014-03-07SenateReturned For Concurrence
2014-03-06SenatePassed As Amended
2014-03-06SenateAmended
2014-03-04SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2014-03-04SenateDR - TSDPAA: JB To DP
2014-02-27SenateDR - TSDPAA: DP To JB
2014-02-14SenateReferred To Drug Policy;Judiciary, Division B
2014-02-07HouseTransmitted To Senate
2014-02-06HousePassed
2014-01-28HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2014-01-20HouseReferred To Judiciary A

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback