MS HB1217 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 17-21-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Decrease The Population Threshold From 25,000 To 20,000 For Municipalities To Allow Such Municipalities To Grant Exemptions From Ad Valorem Taxation, Except Ad Valorem Taxation For School District Purposes, For A Certain Prescribed Period For Certain Structures Lying Within Designated Business Improvement Districts, Urban Renewal Districts Or Redevelopment Districts; To Amend Section 27-31-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of Any Municipality To Grant Exemptions From Ad Valorem Taxation, Except Ad Valorem Taxation For School District Purposes, For Improvements To Or Renovations That Are Made In Municipally Designated Residential Renewal Districts For A Period Of Not More Than 10 Years From The Date Of The Completion Of The Improvements To Or Renovations Of Such Districts; To Amend Section 27-31-32, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of Any Municipality To Grant Exemptions From Ad Valorem Taxation, Except Ad Valorem Taxation For School District Purposes, For Improvements To Or Renovations That Are Made In Municipally Designated Residential Renovation Districts For A Period Of Not More Than 10 Years From The Date Of The Completion Of The Improvements To Or Renovations Of Such Districts; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ad valorem taxes; provide certain exemptions for business, residential renewal and residential renovation districts in municipalities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-25 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12 Approved by Governor
2018-04-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2018-04-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2018-03-25SenateConference Report Adopted
2018-03-25HouseConference Report Adopted
2018-03-24SenateConference Report Filed
2018-03-24HouseConference Report Filed
2018-03-23SenateConferees Named Fillingane,Kirby,Carter
2018-03-21HouseConferees Named Smith,Lamar,Baker
2018-03-15HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2018-03-14SenateReturned For Concurrence
2018-03-13SenatePassed As Amended
2018-03-13SenateAmended
2018-03-12SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2018-02-16SenateReferred To Finance
2018-02-15HouseTransmitted To Senate
2018-02-14HousePassed
2018-02-14HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2018-01-15HouseReferred To Ways and Means

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback