MS HB1213 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The "living Donor Protection Act"; To Provide Definitions; To Prohibit An Insurer Of A Life, Disability Or Long-term Care Insurance Policy From Declining Or Limiting Coverage Of A Person Under Any Policy Or Otherwise Discriminating Against Such Person Solely Due To The Status Of Such Person As A Living Organ Donor; To Authorize The Mississippi State Department Of Health To Make Any Material It Receives Related To Living Organ Donation From A Recognized Living Organ Donation Organization Available To The Public; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Living Donor Protection Act; create.
Sponsors
Rep. Oscar Denton [D] | Rep. Justis Gibbs [D] | Rep. Jeffery Harness [D] | Rep. Kabir Karriem [D] |
Rep. Carl Mickens [D] | Rep. Rickey Thompson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Passed |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |
2024-03-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-12 | House | Passed |
2024-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-14 | House | Referred To Insurance |