MS HB1213 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 49-2-131, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That In Awarding Grants In Second And Subsequent Rounds Under Municipality And County Water Infrastructure Grant Program, The Department Of Environmental Quality Shall Give Priority To Eligible Applicants That Did Not Receive Funding In Their First Round Grants To Implement Necessary Repairs To Their Existing Water And/or Sewer Systems; To Amend Section 41-3-16.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify That Certain Entities Are Eligible To Participate In The Arpa Rural Water Associations Infrastructure Grant Program; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water Infrastructure Grant Program; DEQ shall give priority to applicants not receiving funding in first round grants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-28SenateDied In Committee
2023-02-14SenateReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
2023-02-10HouseTransmitted To Senate
2023-02-08HousePassed
2023-02-08HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2023-01-26HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2023-01-16HouseReferred To Conservation and Water Resources

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41316Amended CodeSee Bill Text
492131Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback