MS HB1213 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
Pending: Senate Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 25-9-127, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Each State Agency That Is Granted An Exemption From The State Personnel Board Rules, Regulations And Procedures To Submit A Copy Of Its Annual Report To The State Personnel Board, Peer Committee And Legislative Budget Office; To Require The Report To Include Quantifiable Measures Showing That The Exemption Has Helped The Agency Perform More Efficiently Or Effectively; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Personnel Board; require exempted agencies' reports to include quantifiable data and to be sent to SPB, PEER and LBO.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16SenateReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
2021-02-05HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-04HousePassed
2021-01-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-18HouseReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
259127Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback