MS HB1203 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Mississippi Upstart Project To Serve As A Home-based Educational Technology Program To Develop School Readiness Skills Of Preschool Children; To Authorize The State Board Of Education To Contract With A Not-for-profit Organization For Purposes Of Providing Delivery Of The Program For Preschool Children; To Prescribe The Responsibilities And Duties Of The Provider For The Administration Of The Program; To Require That The Contract Provide For One Year Of Funding For The Program With An Option To Extend The Contract For Additional Years Or Expand The Program To A Greater Number Of Preschool Children; To Authorize A Local School To Participate In Mississippi Upstart If The Local School Board Agrees To Work In Cooperation With The Contractor; To Authorize Family Participation In The Program And To Prescribe The Manner Of Soliciting Family Participation; To Authorize The State Board Of Education Or Participating Local School District To Purchase Certain Equipment And Services To Be Used In The Program; To Require An Annual Audit Of The Use Of Funds Used For Mississippi Upstart; To Require That The Audit Requirement Be Included In The Contract; To Require The State Board Of Education To Make An Annual Legislative Report By November 30 Each Year; To Provide That No State General Funds May Be Used To Carry Out The Provisions Of This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi UPSTART project; create.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 91 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Died In Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Referred To Education;Appropriations | |
2011-02-15 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-10 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-02-10 | Amended | |
2011-02-10 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-02-01 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-02-01 | DR - TSDPCS: AP To ED | |
2011-01-27 | DR - TSDPCS: ED To AP | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Education;Appropriations |