MS HB1202 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The "kaelin Kersh Act"; To Amend Section 63-7-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require That Any Operator Of An Emergency Vehicle Authorized To Be Marked With Blinking, Rotating Or Oscillating Lights Shall Use Blinking, Rotating Or Oscillating Lights When Operating The Emergency Vehicle At A Speed In Excess Of Thirty Miles Per Hour Over The Posted Speed Limit; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Kaelin Kersh Act; create.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Chism [R] | Rep. Jay Hughes [D] | Rep. Carl Mickens [D] | Rep. Orlando Paden [D] |
Rep. John Hines [D] | Rep. David Baria [D] | Rep. Ray Rogers [R] | Rep. Tom Weathersby [R] |
Rep. Kathy Sykes [D] | Rep. Jeff Hale [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-04-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Doty,Turner-Ford |
2018-03-19 | House | Conferees Named Gipson,Bailey,Hale |
2018-03-14 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Amended |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2018-02-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-07 | House | Passed |
2018-01-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-15 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |