MS HB1200 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create The "mississippi Mask Usage Act," For The Purpose Of Requiring A Mask Or Face Covering To Be Worn While Inside All Federal, State, County And Municipal Government Facilities Or The Facilities Of Any Political Subdivision Thereof Located Within The State Of Mississippi; To Prescribe Legislative Findings And Intent; To Provide That From February 1, 2021, And For 100 Consecutive Days Thereafter, Masks Or Face Coverings Shall Be Worn In The Government Facilities And Certain Public Places, To Provide That If A Federal Mask Or Face Covering Mandate Is Enacted, It's Requirement Shall Be Effective For Not More Than 100 Consecutive Days In The State Of Mississippi, And The Statewide Mandate Is To Run Concurrent With The Federal Mandate To The Date Of Its Expiration Or May 12, 2021, Whichever Date Should Occur Earliest; To Define The Term "public Places" For Purpose Of Compliance With This Act; To Provide Exceptions When A Mask Or Face Covering Is Not Required To Be Worn; To Prescribe Penalties For Violation Of The Mask Mandate; To Provide For The Automatic Repeal Of This Act Upon The Expiration Of The 100 Consecutive Day Mandate; To Bring Forward Section 33-15-43, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Mississippi Mask Usage Act"; enact to require masks to be worn in federal and state government facilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-02HouseDied In Committee
2021-01-18HouseReferred To Public Health and Human Services;Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
331543New CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback