MS HB1200 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Establish The "forming Open And Robust University Minds (forum) Act," As It Relates To Freedom Of Speech On The Campuses Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning; To Prohibit A State Institution Of Higher Learning From Denying A Religious, Political Or Ideological Student Organization A Benefit Or Privilege Available To Another Student Organization, Or Otherwise Discriminate Against Such An Organization, Based On The Expression Of The Organization; To Require State Institutions Of Higher Learning To Develop And Make Available Materials Explaining The Policy For Campus Staff And Students; To Require State Institutions Of Higher Learning To Submit A Yearly Report Detailing The Course Of Action Implemented To Comply With The Policy; To Prescribe A One-year Statute Of Limitations For Actions Brought Under This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
"Forming Open and Robust University Minds (FORUM) Act"; establish.
Sponsors
Rep. Stacey Hobgood-Wilkes [R] | Rep. William Andrews [R] | Rep. Chris Brown [R] | Rep. Dan Eubanks [R] |
Rep. Brady Williamson [R] | Rep. Randy Boyd [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 68 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Constitution;Universities and Colleges |
2020-03-17 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-12 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-12 | House | Amended |
2020-03-12 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-03-11 | House | Read the Third Time |
2020-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Constitution |