MS HB1200 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Establish A Municipal Water, Sewer And Wastewater Systems Repair And Replacement Grant Program To Be Administered By The Department Of Environmental Quality For The Purpose Of Assisting Municipalities With The Costs Of Repairing And Replacing Damaged, Outdated Or Inefficient Water And Sewer System Lines And Wastewater Treatment Facilities; To Provide That In Order For A Municipality To Be Eligible For A Grant Under The Provisions Of This Act, The Municipality Must Present To The Department Of Environmental Quality A Plan For Repairing And Replacing Water Or Sewer System Lines Or Wastewater Treatment Facilities In The Municipality, And Must Agree To Provide Matching Funds Equal To Twenty Percent Of The Amount Of The Grant; To Create In The State Treasury A Special Fund To Be Known As The Municipal Water, Sewer And Wastewater Systems Repair And Replacement Grant Program Fund; To Provide That The Fund Will Consist Of Monies Appropriated By The Legislature For Funding The Program, And Any Other Monies That The Legislature May Designate For Deposit Into The Fund; To Provide That Monies In The Fund May Be Expended Upon Legislative Appropriation For Making Grants To Municipalities For The Purposes Specified In This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Municipal Water, Sewer and Wastewater Systems Repair and Replacement Grant Program; create.
Sponsors
Rep. Missy Warren McGee [R] | Rep. Roun McNeal [R] | Rep. Brad Touchstone [R] | Rep. Scott Bounds [R] |
Rep. Tom Miles [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2018-02-02 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-01 | House | Passed |
2018-01-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-15 | House | Referred To Municipalities |