MS HB1199 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Mississippi Windstorm Mitigation Coordinating Council; To Provide The Membership Of The Council; To Provide For The Operation Of The Council; To Provide That The Mississippi Building Codes Council Shall Serve As An Advisory Council To The Mississippi Windstorm Mitigation Coordinating Council; To Create The "mississippi Windstorm Mitigation Fund" To Receive Monies To Be Used For The Purposes Of Assisting The Mississippi Windstorm Mitigation Coordinating Council In Developing And Implementing A Comprehensive And Coordinated Approach For Windstorm Mitigation; To Amend Section 83-34-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Mississippi Windstorm Underwriting Association To Enter Into Contractual Agreements With Third Parties For The Purposes Of Developing And Implementing Windstorm Mitigation Programs; To Amend Section 83-1-37, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Use Of Certain Monies From The Municipal Fire Protection Fund To Be Used For Windstorm Mitigation; To Amend Section 83-1-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Use Of Certain County Insurance Rebate Monies To Be Used For Windstorm Mitigation; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Windstorm Mitigation Coordinating Council; create.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Bennett [R] | Sen. Scott DeLano [R] | Rep. Casey Eure [R] | Rep. Alex Monsour [R] |
Rep. Randall Patterson [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-17 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 110 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 110 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-03-24 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-23 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-17 | Concurred in Amend From Senate | |
2011-03-07 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-03-03 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-03 | Amended | |
2011-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-02-17 | Referred To Insurance | |
2011-02-14 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-09 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-02-09 | Amended | |
2011-02-08 | Tabled Subject To Call | |
2011-02-08 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-01-26 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Insurance |