MS HB1198 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Require Health Insurance Policies That Provide Pregnancy Related Benefits To Provide Coverage For Medically Necessary Expenses Of Diagnosis And Treatment Of Infertility; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health insurance policies; require certain to provide infertility coverage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 82 N: 27 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-27SenateDied In Committee
2018-02-16SenateReferred To Insurance;Appropriations
2018-02-12HouseTransmitted To Senate
2018-02-07HousePassed
2018-02-07HouseAmendment Withdrawn
2018-02-07HousePoint of Order Withdrawn
2018-02-07HouseSet Aside-Pend Ruling of Chair
2018-02-07HousePoint of Order Raised
2018-02-07HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2018-01-30HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2018-01-15HouseReferred To Insurance

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback