MS HB1196 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Codify New Section 41-41-34.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit An Abortion Of An Unborn Human Individual With A Detectable Fetal Heartbeat Except When A Medical Emergency Necessitates; To Authorize And Direct The State Board Of Health To Promulgate Regulations For The Appropriate Methods Of Performing An Examination For The Presence Of A Fetal Heartbeat; To Amend Section 73-25-29, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A Physician Performing An Abortion On A Pregnant Woman Before Determining If The Unborn Human Individual Has A Detectable Fetal Heartbeat Is Subject To License Revocation Or Disciplinary Action; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Abortion; prohibit an abortion of an unborn human individual with a detectable heartbeat.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Aldridge [R] | Rep. William Arnold [R] | Rep. Nick Bain [R] | Rep. Mark Baker [R] |
Rep. Richard Bennett [R] | Rep. Chris Brown [R] | Rep. Casey Eure [R] | Rep. Andy Gipson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 78 N: 36 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Died In Committee | |
2012-03-28 | Referred To Judiciary, Division B;Public Health and Welfare | |
2012-03-19 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-15 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2012-03-14 | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Wooten, Gipson, Buck (72nd)) | |
2012-03-14 | Passed | |
2012-03-14 | Amendment Failed | |
2012-03-14 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2012-03-13 | Read the Third Time | |
2012-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2012-03-01 | DR - TSDPCS: PH To JB | |
2012-03-01 | DR - TSDPCS: JB To PH | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Judiciary B;Public Health and Human Services |