MS HB1185 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Bring Forward Section 27-103-302, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides That Certain Funds Received By Or On Behalf Of The State Of Mississippi Through A Negotiated Settlement For Economic Damages In Connection With The Deepwater Horizon Oil Spill Shall Be Deposited Into The Budget Contingency Fund, For The Purposes Of Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
BP oil spill settlement funds; bring forward section requiring deposit into the BCF.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Died In Conference |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Wiggins,Burton |
2018-03-19 | House | Conferees Named Read,DeLano,Huddleston (15th) |
2018-03-13 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Amended |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2018-02-12 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-07 | House | Passed |
2018-02-07 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2018-02-06 | House | Read the Third Time |
2018-01-30 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2018-01-15 | House | Referred To Appropriations |