MS HB1183 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 27-65-75, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Provision That Provides For A Diversion Of Sales Tax Revenue To The Mississippi Development Authority Job Training Grant Fund; To Repeal Section 57-1-451, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Creates The Mississippi Development Authority Job Training Grant Fund And To Provide That The Remaining Balance In The Fund Shall Be Transferred To The State General Fund; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mississippi Development Authority Job Training Grant Fund; repeal and transfer balance to the General Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateDied In Committee
2019-02-20SenateReferred To Finance
2019-02-08HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-06HousePassed As Amended
2019-02-06HouseAmended
2019-02-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Ways and Means

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback