MS HB1177 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The "mississippi False Claims Act"; To Prohibit Any Person From Knowingly Presenting, Or Causing To Be Presented, A False Or Fraudulent Claim For Payment Or Approval To A State Agency Or Any Employee Or Agent Of A State Agency; To Require State Agencies To Diligently Investigate Suspected Violations Of The Act; To Authorize Civil Action By A Qui Tam Plaintiff; To Provide For A Monetary Award To The Qui Tam Plaintiff Out Of The Proceeds Of The Action Or Settlement, If Any; To Bar Certain Civil Actions; To Provide A Statute Of Limitations For Bringing A Civil Action Under The Act; To Prohibit Employer Interference With Employee Disclosure; To Provide That The Remedies Provided In The Act Are Not Exclusive And Shall Be In Addition To Any Other Remedies Provided By Law; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi False Claims Act; create.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Baker [R] | Rep. Cory Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-31 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 15 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2018-02-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-08 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2018-02-01 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Baria, Baker, Wilson) |
2018-01-31 | House | Passed |
2018-01-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-15 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |