MS HB1177 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Joint Legislative And Paraprofessional Education And Mental Health Study Committee To Study And Make Annual Recommendations To The Governor And The Regular Session Of The Legislature Regarding The Need For Assistance In Shaping Public Policy To Improve Student Outcomes And Educational Opportunities For Students With Serious Emotional, Behavioral Disorders; To Provide For The Membership Of The Task Force; To Set Forth The Duties Of The Task Force; To Amend Section 1, Chapter 484, Laws Of 2010, To Revise The Composition Of The Task Force To Study Strategies For Solving The Current Teacher Shortage In Mississippi And To Extend The Date Of Its Dissolution Until The Filing Of Its Legislative Report In 2013; To Set Forth The Duties Of The Study Committee; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Joint Education and Mental Health Study Committee; create to study services provided to children with mental disorders.
Sponsors
Rep. Cecil Brown [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-04-05 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-04-01 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-30 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-29 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-28 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-28 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-17 | Conferees Named Carmichael,Bryan,Harden | |
2011-03-10 | Conferees Named Brown,Clarke,Holland | |
2011-03-08 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2011-03-03 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-03-02 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-02 | Amended | |
2011-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-02-22 | DR - TSDPAA: ED To PH | |
2011-02-14 | Referred To Education;Public Health and Welfare | |
2011-02-10 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-08 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-02-08 | Amended | |
2011-02-08 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-02-01 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-02-01 | DR - TSDPCS: PH To ED | |
2011-01-27 | DR - TSDPCS: ED To PH | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Education;Public Health and Human Services |