MS HB1173 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-21-605, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Conditions Under Which A Child May Be Committed To The State Training School Or Ordered Into Secure Detention As A Disposition; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Secure detention and state training school; revise conditions under which a child may be ordered to by court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2020-03-06 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-02-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Youth and Family Affairs |