MS HB1170 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Providing For The Creation Of An Advisory Committee To Study Areas Of This State That Are Underserved In The Retail Of Availability Of Healthy Foods And The Impact Of The Limited Retail Availability Of Such Foods On Proper Nutrition And On Obesity And Related Chronic Illnesses; To Provide For The Membership Of The Advisory Committee; To Set Forth The Duties Of The Advisory Committee; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Healthy foods; create advisory committee to study areas of state underserved in retail availability of.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 109 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-26 Approved by Governor
2011-04-05 Enrolled Bill Signed
2011-04-01 Enrolled Bill Signed
2011-03-29 Conference Report Adopted
2011-03-29 Conference Report Adopted
2011-03-28 Conference Report Filed
2011-03-28 Conference Report Filed
2011-03-18 Conferees Named Bryan,Hewes,Frazier
2011-03-09 Conferees Named Holland,Barker,Hines
2011-03-08 Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
2011-02-28 Returned For Concurrence
2011-02-25 Passed As Amended
2011-02-25 Amended
2011-02-24 Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
2011-02-10 Referred To Public Health and Welfare
2011-02-09 Transmitted To Senate
2011-02-08 Passed
2011-01-27 Title Suff Do Pass
2011-01-17 Referred To Public Health and Human Services

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback