MS HB1167 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize The Department Of Finance And Administration, Acting On Behalf Of The Board Of Trustees Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning, To Sell And Convey Parcels Of Certain State-owned Real Property And Any Improvements Thereon Under The Possession And Control Of The Delta State University, Located In The City Of Cleveland, Bolivar County, Mississippi; To Authorize The Department Of Finance And Administration, Acting On Behalf Of The Department Of Wildlife, Fisheries And Parks, To Donate And Convey To The Board Of Supervisors Of Coahoma County, Mississippi, All Title And Interest In Certain Real Property Accepted By And Under The Possession And Control Of The Department Of Wildlife, Fisheries And Parks Known As Moon Lake Park, Located In Coahoma County, Mississippi; To Authorize The Department Of Archives And History To Extinguish, Abandon And Nullify Any Conservation Easement Granted By The Friends Of The Siege And Battle Of Corinth, Inc., When Determined To Be Necessary Or Convenient For The Use Or Ownership Of Such Lands By The United States National Park Service; To Amend Section 6, Chapter 561, Laws Of 2009, To Require The Department Of Finance And Administration To Convey To The Mississippi Transportation Commission Certain Real Property Within The City Of Jackson, Hinds County, Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public university property; authorize DFA to sell and convey for benefit of Delta State University.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-26 Approved by Governor
2011-04-04 Enrolled Bill Signed
2011-04-01 Enrolled Bill Signed
2011-03-28 Conference Report Adopted
2011-03-28 Conference Report Adopted
2011-03-25 Conference Report Filed
2011-03-25 Conference Report Filed
2011-03-15 Conferees Named Burton,Mettetal,Jackson (32nd)
2011-03-09 Conferees Named Coleman (65th),Bounds,Buck (5th)
2011-03-08 Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
2011-03-03 Returned For Concurrence
2011-03-02 Passed As Amended
2011-03-02 Amended
2011-02-24 Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
2011-02-14 Referred To Public Property
2011-02-10 Transmitted To Senate
2011-02-08 Passed As Amended
2011-02-08 Amended
2011-01-26 Title Suff Do Pass
2011-01-25 DR - TSDP: PP To UC
2011-01-17 Referred To Public Property;Universities and Colleges

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback