MS HB1163 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Direct The State Superintendent Of Public Education, The Commissioner Of Higher Education And The Executive Director Of The State Board For Community And Junior Colleges, Acting Jointly, To Develop A Comprehensive Report And Recommendations On The Implementation And Operations Of "early College High Schools"; To Require That The Report Be Submitted To The 2012 Legislature With Specific Recommendations On The Establishment Of An Early College High School Pilot Program In The State Of Mississippi; To Require The State Department Of Education, In Conjunction With The Board Of Trustees Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning And The State Board For Community And Junior Colleges, To Study And Develop A Comprehensive Report And Recommendations On The Establishment Of An Adult High School Diploma; To Provide For Certain Legislative Members And A Gubernatorial Appointment To Serve On The Study Panel For The Establishment Of An Adult High School Diploma; To Amend Section 37-29-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity; To Repeal Section 37-15-37, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides Authority To Local School Districts And The Board Of Trustees Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning To Establish Dual Enrollment Programs Allowing Certain High School Students To Enroll In State Institutions Of Higher Learning, And Section 37-101-28, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For Articulation Agreements On Dual Credit Courses Taken By High School Students; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early college high schools; direct certain state education leaders to study and recommend establishment of pilot program for.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-26 Approved by Governor
2011-04-04 Enrolled Bill Signed
2011-04-01 Enrolled Bill Signed
2011-03-29 Conference Report Adopted
2011-03-28 Conference Report Adopted
2011-03-27 Conference Report Filed
2011-03-27 Conference Report Filed
2011-03-17 Conferees Named Carmichael,Blount,Wilemon
2011-03-10 Conferees Named Brown,Straughter,Holloway
2011-03-08 Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
2011-03-03 Returned For Concurrence
2011-03-02 Passed As Amended
2011-03-02 Amended
2011-02-28 Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
2011-02-24 DR - TSDPAA: ED To UC
2011-02-14 Referred To Education;Universities and Colleges
2011-02-10 Transmitted To Senate
2011-02-09 Passed
2011-01-26 Title Suff Do Pass
2011-01-24 DR - TSDP: ED To UC
2011-01-17 Referred To Education;Universities and Colleges

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback