MS HB1162 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 15-1-59, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Statute Of Limitations For Personal Actions For Child Sexual Abuse; To Bring Forward Section 99-1-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides Time Limitations For Prosecution Of Crimes, For Purposes Of Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 15-1-49, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides Limitations For Personal Actions That Are Not Specifically Provided For In The Law; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Child sexual abuse; revise statute of limitatitons for claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2024-02-29 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-02-28 | House | Passed As Amended |
2024-02-28 | House | Amended |
2024-02-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-02-14 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 1 | 49 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 1 | 59 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
99 | 1 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |