MS HB1162 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 41-29-113, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Add Flualprazolam, Flubromazepam, Flubromazolam And Clonazolam To Schedule I Because These Drugs Have No Legitimate Medical Use And Have High Potency With Great Potential To Cause Harm; To Amend Section 41-29-115, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Schedule Ii To Clarify The Chemical Name Of Thiafentanil; To Amend Section 41-29-119, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Add To Schedule Iv The Drugs Brexanolone (zulresso) And Solriamfetol (sunosi) Because These Drugs Recently Have Been Approved For Medical Use By The Federal Drug Administration; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Uniform Control Substance Act; revise schedule to add certain substances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred To Drug Policy;Judiciary, Division B |
2020-03-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed |
2020-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Drug Policy |