MS HB1160 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds To Provide Funds To Assist In Paying Costs Associated With Construction, Furnishing And Equipping Of The Mississippi Center For Medically Fragile Children And Related Facilities At State-owned Property In Jackson, Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bonds; authorize issuance for construction of the Mississippi Center for Medically Fragile Children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 108 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Approved by Governor
2019-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-11SenateReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-07SenatePassed
2019-03-07SenateAmendment Failed
2019-03-06SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Finance
2019-02-21HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-20HousePassed As Amended
2019-02-20HouseAmended
2019-02-20HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-02-19HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Ways and Means

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback