MS HB1157 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 49-1-35, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Commission On Wildlife, Fisheries And Parks To Set Fees For Subscriptions To An Official Magazine; To Authorize The Publishing Of A Digital Magazine; To Authorize The Department Of Wildlife, Fisheries And Parks To Sell Advertisements To Offset The Cost Of The Magazine; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Outdoor magazine; authorize commission on Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks to set subscription fee and publish digital version.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Passed |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks |
2016-03-01 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-02-29 | House | Passed |
2016-02-25 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-02-18 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks |