MS HB1143 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 97-3-82, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide When An Inmate Has Committed Felony Extortion; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Felony extortion; provide when inmates have committed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-27SenateDied In Committee
2018-02-12SenateReferred To Corrections
2018-02-08HouseTransmitted To Senate
2018-02-07HousePassed
2018-01-30HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2018-01-15HouseReferred To Corrections

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback