MS HB1143 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 27-103-303, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Maximum Amount That May Be Transferred From The Capital Expense Fund To The Bureau Of Building To Provide Funds For Emergency Repairs On State-owned Buildings For Any Single Emergency And For All Emergencies During Any Fiscal Year; To Authorize The Capital Expense Fund To Be Used For The Cost Of Providing Security At State Events That Are Held In The City Of Jackson; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Capital Expense Fund; increase amount that may be transferred to provide funds for emergency repairs on state-owned buildings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-03SenateDied In Committee
2015-02-17SenateReferred To Appropriations
2015-02-16HouseTransmitted To Senate
2015-02-11HousePassed As Amended
2015-02-11HouseAmended
2015-02-03HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2015-01-19HouseReferred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback