MS HB1143 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 37-23-69, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Certain Exceptional Children Who Are Determined To Require Placement In A Private Intermediate Care Facility For The Mentally Retarded Or A Psychiatric Residential Treatment Facility Operating An Accredited Nonpublic School Shall Be Eligible And Entitled To Receive State Financial Assistance For The Full Term Of The Placement; To Amend Section 37-23-63, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify That Certain Exceptional Children Attending A Nonpublic School Are Eligible To Receive State Financial Assistance; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exceptional children in inpatient facilities; shall be eligible for state financial assistance for full term of placement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-01 Died In Committee
2011-02-17 Referred To Education;Appropriations
2011-02-14 Transmitted To Senate
2011-02-10 Passed
2011-02-10 Committee Substitute Adopted
2011-02-01 Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2011-01-17 Referred To Public Health and Human Services

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback