MS HB1139 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 77-5-203, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of Certain Terms As Used In The Electric Power Association Law; To Amend Section 77-5-207, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Period Of Duration Of A Corporation Formed Under This Article May Be Perpetual; To Amend Section 77-5-209, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify That The Name Of A Corporation Shall Include Either The Words "electric Power Association" Or "electric Cooperative"; To Amend Section 77-5-211, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Procedure For Filing A Certificate Of Incorporation With The Secretary Of State; To Amend Section 77-5-215, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Procedure For A Corporation To Amend Its Certificate Of Incorporation; To Amend Section 77-5-217, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Procedure Whereby Two Or More Corporations May Enter Into An Agreement For Consolidation; To Amend Section 77-5-219, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Procedure For Dissolution Of A Corporation; To Amend Section 77-5-221, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Provision Providing For The Annual Election Of A Board Of Directors; To Amend Section 77-5-223, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Powers Of The Board Of Directors; To Amend Section 77-5-225, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete Certain Language Regarding Rates To Nonmembers; To Amend Section 77-5-229, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make A Nonsubstantive Change; To Amend Section 77-5-231, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Specific Powers Of A Corporation Formed Under This Article; To Amend Section 77-5-233, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A Corporation Shall Continue To Have The Power To Acquire, Construct, Own, Invest In, Operate, Maintain And/or Improve Generating And/or Transmission Assets; To Amend Section 77-5-235, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That All Rates Of A Corporation Formed Under This Article Shall Be Established By The Corporation's Board With Certain Exceptions; To Amend Section 77-5-239, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize A Corporation To Incur Obligations And Liabilities, Borrow Money, Issue Notes, Bonds, Certificates Of Indebtedness And Other Obligations, And To Enter Contracts Of Guaranty; To Amend Section 77-5-241, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Any Note, Bond Or Other Indebtedness Issued By A Corporation May Bear Such Interest Rate Or Rates As May Be Determined By The Board Of Directors; To Amend Section 77-5-243, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Security For Obligations Of A Corporation; To Amend Section 77-5-247, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Monies Of A Corporation Shall Be Deposited Or Invested In One Or More Banks, Trust Companies, Financial Institutions Or Such Other Public Or Private Entities As May Be Approved By The Board Of Directors; To Amend Section 77-5-249, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A Corporation And Its Property Shall Be Taxed And Assessed In Accordance With The Laws Of The State Of Mississippi; To Amend Section 77-5-253, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Each Corporation To Submit Financial And Compliance Audits To The Mississippi Public Service Commission And Public Utilities Staff; To Amend Section 77-5-255, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Mediation Proceedings Of Disputes Between Members Or Customers And Electric Power Associations; To Create Section 77-5-257, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Declare That The Mississippi Public Service Commission And Political Subdivisions Of The State Shall Not Have Jurisdiction Over Those Portions Or Aspects Of A Corporation's Operations, Facilities, Services Or Rates That Are Regulated By The Tennessee Valley Authority; To Create Section 77-5-259, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Limit The Time By Which An Action May Be Commenced For Collection Or Reimbursement Arising From A Billing Error By A Corporation; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Electric power associations; revise regulatory laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Passed |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred To Energy |
2016-03-02 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-02-29 | House | Passed |
2016-02-29 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2016-02-25 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-02-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred To Public Utilities |