MS HB1139 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Designate A Certain Segment Of U.s. Highway 49w In Humphreys County As "rev. George W. Lee Memorial Highway"; And For Related Purposes.
Title
U.S. Highway 49W; designate certain segment of in Humphreys County as "Rev. George W. Lee Memorial Highway."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-03-01 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-01 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-02-25 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-24 | Passed | |
2011-02-23 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-02-10 | Referred To Highways and Transportation | |
2011-02-09 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-09 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2011-02-08 | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Holloway, McBride, Bell) | |
2011-02-08 | Passed | |
2011-01-26 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Transportation |