MS HB1135 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 23-15-913, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Specify Which Judges Have Jurisdiction To Hear Election Disputes On Election Day; To Amend Section 23-15-951, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require That Election Day Disputes Be Heard By Judges Who Have Been Selected By The Chief Justice Of The Supreme Court To Hear Said Disputes; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Election day disputes; require list of judges selected to hear to be provided to certain officials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 102 N: 7 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 102 N: 7 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2024-04-24 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2024-04-23 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Conferees Named England,Fillingane,Chassaniol |
2024-04-16 | House | Conferees Named Sanford,Tullos,Wallace |
2024-04-16 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Elections |
2024-03-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed |
2024-03-07 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-02-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-02-14 | House | Referred To Apportionment and Elections |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 15 | 913 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
23 | 15 | 951 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |