MS HB1130 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 93-21-107, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Matching Funds Requirement For The State Domestic Violence Fund; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State Domestic Violence Fund; remove match requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2020-03-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed |
2020-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Appropriations |