MS HB113 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-61-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Maximum Waiting Period For Production Of Records Under An Open Records Request; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Open records; revise time period available to a public body for response and allowable costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 43 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 91 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 81 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 43 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 91 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 81 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-31 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-25 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-22 | Conferees Named Tollison,Blount,Wilemon | |
2010-03-17 | Conferees Named Blackmon,Cockerham,Norquist | |
2010-03-15 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2010-03-05 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-04 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-04 | Amended | |
2010-03-02 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-10 | Referred To Judiciary, Division B | |
2010-02-10 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-08 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-02-08 | Amended | |
2010-02-08 | Reconsidered | |
2010-02-01 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2010-02-01 | Passed | |
2010-02-01 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-01-19 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-01-05 | Referred To Judiciary A |