MS HB1126 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-101-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Taxing Entities To File Their Annual Report On Tax Revenues With The Department Of Revenue Instead Of The State Auditor; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Taxing entities; require to file annual report on tax revenues with Department of Revenue instead of State Auditor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | House | Died On Calendar |
2017-02-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2017-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-31 | House | DR - TSDP: WM To AC |
2017-01-25 | House | DR - TSDP: AC To WM |
2017-01-16 | House | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Ways and Means |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/history/HB/HB1126.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/HB/1100-1199/HB1126IN.htm |