MS HB1123 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-21-51, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prescribe Standards And Benchmarks Under The Early Learning Collaborative Act; To Authorize Technical Teacher And Teacher Assistant Support Services; To Require Individualized Professional Development Plans And Approved Curriculum; To Require The Department Of Education To Provide The Governor And The Legislature With An Evaluation Of Program Effectiveness; To Require The Peer Committee To Review The Department Of Education's Evaluations And Annual Reports And Submit A Summary Of Its Findings To The Legislature; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Early Learning Collaborative Act of 2013; revise funding and specify teaching standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 113 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-18 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Amended |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-03-02 | Senate | DR - TSDPAA: ED To AP |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Education;Appropriations |
2021-02-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed |
2021-02-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-02 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To ED |
2021-01-28 | House | DR - TSDP: ED To AP |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Education;Appropriations |