MS HB1117 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-21-353, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That In Cases Of Reports Of Child Abuse Or Neglect To The Department Of Child Protection Services, If The Department Determines That A Parent Or Other Person Responsible For The Care Or Welfare Of An Abused Or Neglected Child Maintains Active Duty Status Within The Military, Then The Department Shall Notify The Applicable Military Installation Family Advocacy Program That There Is An Allegation Of Abuse Or Neglect That Relates To That Child; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Child abuse; require CPS to notify applicable military installation family adovacy program in certain cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |
2019-02-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-02-12 | House | Passed |
2019-02-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-21 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |