MS HB1116 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 25-41-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Notice Of Called Special Meetings To Be Posted To A Public Body's Website Not Less Than One Hour Before The Meeting, Except For Municipalities And Counties With A Certain Population; To Provide That A Copy Of The Notice Shall Be Transmitted To Any Citizen And Any Publication, Broadcast And Digital Media Not Less Than One Hour Before The Meeting If Requested In Writing To Receive The Notice; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special meetings; require notice of to be posted on public body's website.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-15 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 65 N: 53 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-22 Approved by Governor
2017-03-16SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2017-03-16HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2017-03-15HouseConcurred in Amend From Senate
2017-03-03SenateReturned For Concurrence
2017-03-02SenatePassed As Amended
2017-03-02SenateAmended
2017-02-24SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2017-02-21SenateReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
2017-02-13HouseTransmitted To Senate
2017-02-09HousePassed As Amended
2017-02-09HouseAmended
2017-02-09HouseReconsidered
2017-02-07HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Hood, Turner, Foster)
2017-02-07HousePassed As Amended
2017-02-07HouseAmended
2017-01-25HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2017-01-16HouseReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/history/HB/HB1116.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/HB/1100-1199/HB1116IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/HB/1100-1199/HB1116PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/HB/1100-1199/HB1116SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/ham/HB1116_H_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/ham/HB1116_H_Amend_02.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/sam/HB1116_S_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/votes/house/0360024.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/votes/house/0380007.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/votes/senate/0590023.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/votes/house/0720003.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback