MS HB1106 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Bring Forward Section 37-29-65, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendments; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Community college board of trustees; provide for the selection of for Hinds Community College District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Universities and Colleges;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2020-03-17 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-12 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-12 | House | Amended |
2020-03-05 | House | Tabled Subject To Call |
2020-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Universities and Colleges |