MS HB1098 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 19-5-177, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit The Board Of Commissioners Of Certain Fire Protection Districts From Imposing Fees If The Board Of Supervisors Of A County Has Levied A Special Tax For A Fire Protection District; To Amend Section 19-5-195, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Section; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Fire protection districts; prohibit charging of fees when board of supervisors has levied special tax for.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Byrd [R] | Rep. Jeff Hale [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-09 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Amended |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-28 | Senate | DR - TSDPAA: CA To FI |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Referred To County Affairs;Finance |
2022-02-07 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-02 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-02-02 | House | Amended |
2022-01-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To County Affairs |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 5 | 177 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 5 | 195 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |