MS HB1095 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 20 Of Chapter 76, Laws Of 2010, To Correct An Error In The Number Of Authorized Full-time Permanent Positions For The Bureau Of Parks And Recreation Of The Department Of Wildlife, Fisheries And Parks For Fiscal Year 2011; To Amend Section 3 Of Chapter 57, Laws Of 2010, To Increase The Number Of Authorized Full-time Permanent Positions For The Division Of Medical Examiner Of The Department Of Public Safety For Fiscal Year 2011; To Amend Section 4 Of Chapter 42, Laws Of 2010, To Decrease The Amount For The Center For Advanced Vehicular System And To Provide Funds For The Mississippi Technology Alliance For Fiscal Year 2011; To Rename The Mississippi Department Of Transportation Building In Jackson, Hinds County, Mississippi, The "william J. 'billy' Mccoy Building"; To Name The Mississippi Emergency Management Agency Building In Pearl, Rankin County, Mississippi, The "haley R. Barbour Building"; To Name The Mississippi Department Of Public Safety's Highway Patrol District Office In Meridian, Lauderdale County, Mississippi, The "charles L. Young, Sr., District Office"; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State agencies; revise certain provisions in FY11 appropriation bills for several.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 81 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 81 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-04-07 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-04-07 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-04-04 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-04-04 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-04-04 | Recommitted For Further Conf | |
2011-04-04 | Recommitted For Further Conf | |
2011-04-04 | Set Aside-Pend Ruling of Chair | |
2011-04-04 | Point of Order Raised | |
2011-04-04 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-04-04 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-31 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 145 | |
2011-03-18 | Conferees Named Davis,Carmichael,Montgomery | |
2011-03-09 | Conferees Named Stringer,Sullivan,Brown | |
2011-03-08 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2011-03-07 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-03-04 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-04 | Amended | |
2011-02-24 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-02-07 | Referred To Appropriations | |
2011-02-07 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-02 | Passed | |
2011-02-02 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-02-01 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Appropriations |