MS HB1087 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 23-15-907, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define "caregiver", "family Member" And "household Member" For The Purposes Of The Ballot Harvesting Law; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Ballot harvesting; include certain definitions in prohibition on.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 82 N: 33 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Elections |
2024-03-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-14 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2024-03-07 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Karriem, Sanford, Tullos) |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed |
2024-02-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred To Apportionment and Elections |