MS HB1083 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 38-2)
Status: Failed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 97-37-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Any Person Who Has An Enhanced Firearms License To Carry Such Firearm On Public Property; To Amend Section 45-9-101, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Amendment; To Amend Section 45-9-171, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise "the Mississippi Church Protection Act"; To Bring Forward Sections 97-37-9 And 97-3-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For Purposes Of Amendment; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms, authorize those with enhanced carry to bring onto public property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 27 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 81 N: 29 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22HouseDied On Calendar
2018-03-09SenateReturned For Concurrence
2018-03-07SenatePassed As Amended
2018-03-07SenateAmended
2018-02-27SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2018-02-16SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A
2018-02-12HouseTransmitted To Senate
2018-02-08HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2018-02-07HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Perkins, Gipson, Bailey, Holland)
2018-02-07HousePassed As Amended
2018-02-07HouseAmended
2018-02-07HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2018-01-25HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2018-01-15HouseReferred To Judiciary B

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2018/pdf/history/HB/HB1083.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/HB/1000-1099/HB1083IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/HB/1000-1099/HB1083CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/HB/1000-1099/HB1083PS.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/ham/HB1083_H_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/sam/HB1083_S_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/sam/HB1083_S_Amend_01_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/sam/HB1083_S_Amend_02_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/sam/HB1083_S_Subst_1_for_Amend_01_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2018/pdf/votes/house/0370002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2018/pdf/votes/senate/0650030.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback