MS HB1048 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 23-15-299, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Qualifying Deadline From March 1 To February 1 For Governor, Lieutenant Governor, Attorney General, Secretary Of State, State Treasurer, Auditor Of Public Accounts, Commissioner Of Insurance, Commissioner Of Agriculture And Commerce, State Highway Commissioner, State Public Service Commissioner, District Attorney, State Senator, State Representative, Sheriff, Chancery Clerk, Circuit Clerk, Tax Assessor, Tax Collector, County Attorney, Board Of Supervisors, County Surveyor, County Coroner, Justice Court Judge And Constable; To Amend Section 23-15-213, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Qualifying Deadline For Election Commissioners From The First Monday In June To February 1; To Amend Section 23-15-977, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Qualifying Deadline From March 1 To February 1 For Supreme Court Justice, Court Of Appeals Judge, Circuit Judge, Chancellor, County Judge And Family Court Judge; To Bring Forward Sections 23-15-309 And 37-5-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Qualification deadline; change to February 1 for certain statewide, state district, county and county district offices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 115 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-16 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Amended |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Elections |
2021-02-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed |
2021-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Apportionment and Elections |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 15 | 213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
23 | 15 | 299 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
23 | 15 | 309 | New Code | See Bill Text |
23 | 15 | 977 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 5 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |