MS HB1040 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 45-27-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require All Law Enforcement Agencies To Implement An Incident-based Reporting System Within Their Agency Or Department That Meets The Reporting Requirements Of The National Incident-based Reporting System (nibrs) Of The Uniform Crime Reporting Program Of The Federal Bureau Of Investigation; And For Related Purposes.
Title
National Incident-Based Reporting System (NIBRS); require all law enforcement agencies to implement reporting system to comply with.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-04-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Conferees Named Bryan,Simmons (12th),Turner-Ford |
2018-03-19 | House | Conferees Named Gipson,Bailey,Ladner |
2018-03-14 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Amended |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-02-22 | Senate | DR - TSDPAA: JB To AP |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B;Appropriations |
2018-02-12 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2018-02-08 | House | Amended |
2018-02-07 | House | Read the Third Time |
2018-01-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-15 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |