MS HB1034 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create A New Section Of Law To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Persons Who Are Honorably Discharged Veterans Of The United States Armed Forces; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Persons Who Are Recipients Of The Bronze Star; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Persons Who Are Honorably Discharged Veterans Of The United States Armed Forces Who Served In The Vietnam Conflict And Were Awarded A Vietnam Service Ribbon; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motorcycle License Tags To Persons Who Are Veterans Of The United States Armed Forces; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Gold Star Motor Vehicle License Tags To Family Members Of Service Members Who Have Died While Serving On Active Duty In The Armed Forces Of The United States While The United States Was Engaged In Hostile Activities Or A Time Of War And To Provide That One Gold Star License Tag Issued To The Mother Of The Service Member Who Was Killed And One Gold Star License Tag Issued To The Spouse Of The Service Member Who Was Killed Shall Be Exempt From Ad Valorem Taxes, Privilege Taxes And All Other Taxes And Fees; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Persons Who Are Iraq Veterans; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Persons Who Are Afghanistan Veterans; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Persons Who Are Recipients Of The Navy And Marine Corps Medal; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Persons Who Are Combat Veterans; To Prescribe An Additional Fee For The Issuance Of Such Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags; To Provide For The Distribution Of The Additional Fees Collected; To Amend Sections 27-19-56.12, 27-19-56.62, 27-19-56.85, 27-19-56.125, 27-19-56.162, 27-19-56.186, 27-19-56.187, 27-19-56.199, 27-19-56.450, 27-19-56.44 And 27-51-41, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Provisions Of This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Distinctive motor vehicle license tags; revise provisions regarding issuance of various veterans tags.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2020-03-06 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed |
2020-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |