MS HB1033 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Provide That Incarceration Shall Not Automatically Follow The Nonpayment Of A Fine, Restitution, Or Court Costs; To Provide That The Aggregate Total Of The Period Of Incarceration Imposed Pursuant To This Section And The Term Of The Sentence Originally Imposed May Not Exceed The Maximum Term Of Imprisonment Authorized For The Offense; To Amend Sections 99-19-20, 99-37-7 And 47-1-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity To The Preceding Sections; To Amend Section 47-7-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That An Otherwise Ineligible Inmate For Parole Shall Be Eligible For Parole If An Inmate Has Not Been Convicted Of Committing A Crime Of Violence, Drug Trafficking Or As A Habitual Offender And He Or She Has Served At Least 25% Of His Or Her Sentence; To Require The Joint Legislative Committee On Performance Evaluation And Expenditure Review To Conduct A One Time Census Of Jail Populations Throughout The State; To Create The Mississippi Sentencing Disparity Task Force; To Appoint The Members To The Task Force; To Amend Sections 47-7-27 And 47-7-37, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Number Of Prior Revocations Rather Than The Number Of Alleged Technical Violations Shall Be Considered For Purposes Of Revocation Sentencing; To Amend Section 99-19-81, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Sentencing Of Certain Offenders As Habitual Offenders; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Re-entry council; implement certain recommendations thereof.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18 Vetoed
2017-04-03SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2017-03-30HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2017-03-29HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2017-03-28HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Gipson, Bailey)
2017-03-28SenateConference Report Adopted
2017-03-28HouseConference Report Adopted
2017-03-27HouseConference Report Filed
2017-03-27SenateConference Report Filed
2017-03-23SenateConferees Named Tindell,Simmons (12th),DeBar
2017-03-21HouseConferees Named Gipson,Bailey,Hood
2017-03-16HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2017-03-08SenateReturned For Concurrence
2017-03-07SenatePassed As Amended
2017-03-07SenateAmended
2017-02-23SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2017-02-20SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A
2017-02-13HouseTransmitted To Senate
2017-02-10HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2017-02-09HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Wilson, Gipson, Bailey)
2017-02-09HousePassed As Amended
2017-02-09HouseAmended
2017-02-09HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2017-01-26HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2017-01-16HouseReferred To Judiciary B

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/history/HB/HB1033.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/HB/1000-1099/HB1033IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/HB/1000-1099/HB1033CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/HB/1000-1099/HB1033PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/HB/1000-1099/HB1033SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/ham/HB1033_H_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/sam/HB1033_S_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/votes/house/0380040.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/votes/senate/0640005.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/votes/house/0850025.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/votes/senate/0850026.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback