MS HB1033 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-3-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Offenses Of Domestic Violence; To Provide For Criminal Protection Orders; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Domestic violence; revise.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2014-02-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2014-02-13 | House | Passed |
2014-02-12 | House | Read the Third Time |
2014-02-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-20 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |