MS HB1029 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Enact The "local Government Debt Collection Setoff Act"; To Authorize Counties And Municipalities To Submit Certain Debts Owed To Them To The Department Of Revenue For Collection Through A Setoff Against The Debtors' Mississippi Income Tax Refund; To Provide That The Counties And Municipalities Shall Utilize The Mississippi Association Of Supervisors Or The Mississippi Municipal League, As Appropriate, As Their Agents In Utilizing This Procedure; To Provide The Amount Of The Debt And Income Tax Refunds To Which This Act Applies; To Provide For Notice To The Debtor And An Opportunity For The Debtor To Contest And Appeal The Setoff; To Provide For The Duties Of The Department Of Revenue Under This Act; To Impose A Collection Assistance Fee On Each Debt Collected Under This Act; To Authorize The Exchange Of Information Between The Department Of Revenue, Local Governments And Their Member Organizations That Is Necessary To Accomplish And Effectuate The Intent Of This Act; To Provide That Information Obtained From The Department Of Revenue Shall Retain Its Confidentiality And To Provide Penalties For The Unlawful Disclosure Of Such Information; To Amend Section 27-7-83, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Income tax; authorize counties and municipalities to collect certain debts by setoff against a debtor's income tax refund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-31 - House - House Passed (Y: 86 N: 26 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2018-02-01 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-01-31 | House | Passed |
2018-01-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-12 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |