MS HB1026 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create In The State Treasury A Special Fund To Be Known As The "mississippi National Guard State Active Duty Emergency Operations Fund" For The Purpose Of Maintaining Annual General Fund Budget Restrictions And Enabling The Mississippi Military Department To Respond To Domestic Events As Directed By The Governor During Declared States Of Emergency Or In Conjunction With Approved Emergency Management Assistance Compacts; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi National Guard State Active Duty Emergency Operations Fund; create.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-04-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2017-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Hopson,Wiggins |
2017-03-21 | House | Conferees Named Rogers (61st),Henley,Huddleston (15th) |
2017-03-08 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Amended |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2017-02-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-02-08 | House | Passed |
2017-02-08 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2017-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2017-01-30 | House | DR - TSDPCS: AP To MA |
2017-01-24 | House | DR - TSDP: MA To AP |
2017-01-16 | House | Referred To Military Affairs;Appropriations |