MS HB1024 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Sections 99-19-81, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide A Time Period For Qualification Of Certain Habitual Offenders; To Amend Section 99-19-83, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Provisions That Regulate Habitual Offenders; To Remove Restrictions For Reduction Of Parole; To Amend Section 47-7-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Changes; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Habitual offender; revise penalties for.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-10HouseDied On Calendar
2020-06-22SenateConferees Named Wiggins,Sparks,DeBar
2020-06-18HouseConferees Named Bain,Horan,Roberson
2020-06-18HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2020-06-17SenateReturned For Concurrence
2020-06-16SenateMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2020-06-12SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2020-06-11SenatePassed As Amended
2020-06-11SenateAmended
2020-05-27SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2020-05-11SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division B
2020-03-02HouseTransmitted To Senate
2020-02-27HousePassed As Amended
2020-02-27HouseAmended
2020-02-27HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2020-02-18HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2020-02-14HouseReferred To Judiciary B

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback